Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2811   22/08/1930
LNER (1946) 1611   08/02/1946
BR 61611 m/e 04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/08/1930 RAYNHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/222/08/1930
B17/602/1956
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 22/08/1930
Withdrawal Wed 14/10/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956
32B Ipswich 5w/e 19/01/1957
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 01/08/1959
   Withdrawn 14/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2811, name: RAYNHAM HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1611    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61611    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
14/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61611    

prev prev