Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 188 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4700 Week
» 27206 Month
» 330396 Year
» 1551961 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2811 on 22/08/1930
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1611 on 08/02/1946
British Railways 61611 m/e 04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/08/1930 RAYNHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/222/08/1930
B17/602/1956
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 22/08/1930
Withdrawal Wed 14/10/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 22/08/1930
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
30E Colchester 4w/e 17/11/1956
32B Ipswich 5w/e 19/01/1957
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 01/08/1959
   Withdrawn on 14/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC CAM Cambridge on 12/12/1946
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 08/08/1959
WDN   on 14/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2811, name: RAYNHAM HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1611    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61611    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
14/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61611    

prev prev