Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 177 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 177 Week
» 6311 Month
» 234195 Year
» 1455760 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2812 on 22/10/1930
LNER (1946) 1612 m/e 08/1946
BR 61612 m/e 01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/10/1930 HOUGHTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/222/10/1930
B17/603/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 22/10/1930
Withdrawal Tue 29/09/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 22/10/1930
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
30E Colchester 5w/e 14/06/1958
32B Ipswich 4w/e 16/08/1958
   Withdrawn 29/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GRA Grantham 21/08/1947
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   29/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Doncaster Works On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2812, name: HOUGHTON HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1612    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61612    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
29/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61612    

prev prev