Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1000 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7120 Week
» 18691 Month
» 266984 Year
» 1151365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2813   22/10/1930
LNER (1946) 1613 m/e 12/1946
BR 61613 m/e 08/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
22/10/1930 WOODBASTWICK HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/222/10/1930
B17/612/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 22/10/1930
Withdrawal Fri 18/12/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E Colchester 5w/e 14/06/1958
30A Stratford 4w/e 11/10/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn 18/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2813, name: WOODBASTWICK HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1613    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61613    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61613    

prev prev