Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 641 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 7004 Week
» 9586 Month
» 274219 Year
» 1495784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2814 on 23/10/1930
BR 61614 4w/e 25/12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
23/10/1930 CASTLE HEDINGHAM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/223/10/1930
B211/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 23/10/1930
Withdrawal Mon 08/06/1959
Scrapping During 06/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 23/10/1930
COL Colchester 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 08/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   08/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/10/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2814, name: CASTLE HEDINGHAM
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
25/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61614    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
08/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61614    

prev prev