Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2815   29/10/1930
BR 61615 w/e 15/05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
29/10/1930 CULFORD HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/229/10/1930
B204/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 29/10/1930
Withdrawal Mon 09/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
COL Colchester 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 09/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/10/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2815, name: CULFORD HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61615    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
09/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61615    

prev prev