Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1142 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1142 Week
» 3724 Month
» 268357 Year
» 1489922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2816 m/e 10/1930
BR 61616 w/e 24/04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1930 FALLODON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/210/1930
B211/1945
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1930
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1930
COL Colchester 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 07/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   07/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1943 Cambridge Area Notes (By The Cambridge University Railway Club) Interest in the Cambridge area continues to centre upon the procession of locomotives to and from Stratford works. These usually spend some time on the dead road at Cambridge shed before proceeding on their journey; luckily they are then easily visible from the public highway. Only one 'O4' has been so reported recently-6502, which passed through on 31/8, newly repainted. This seems rather a roundabout way to return to Woodford-may the practice continue!
There has been a recent tendency for 'E4's' and 'J15's' to be returned to Norwich via Cambridge; and 7791, 7497, 7516 & 7825 have been seen. Nos. 7360(LIN), 7323(NWE) and 7400(FRO) have been noted returning from Stratford-the former stayed in Cambridge for about three weeks. 7340(BSE) (Bury) has also been to Cambridge and worked in the yard for about a month, presumably on loan, as 7011 & 7190 have gone to Stratford for repair; and the stud of shunting tanks has been further depleted by the loan of 7256 to KL.
No. 2095 was in Cambridge yards on 21/9 presumably returning to Darlington. Nos. 4355, 3400, 089 an 092 have recently been in Cambridge for repairs, whilst 065 was in the yard on 18/9 and probably has gone to Stratford. Light repairs to South Lynn engines are often performed in Cambridge-usually at the back of the running shed unless the lift shop gear is required. This practice results in little check being possible on the rarest of our visitors!
Nos. 8883/7/99 have returned from Stratford rebuilt as class D16/3; 8896 returned not so rebuilt. 8899 is the first of the 8890 series to be rebuilt. 8887 has been transferred from KL to CAM on rebuilding. A number of 'D15's' can be seen still-8867(COL) is almost a daily visitor, and spent some time recently in the lift shops; 8881/90/3/5/6(KL) of King's Lynn often appear; 8892/7(BSE) of Bury appear on most days whilst 7764 is stationed at Cambridge.
The large stud of Passenger locomotives attached results in a certain dullness of workings. Duties on the Liverpool St. line are split between Cambridge and Stratford; there is one regular Colchester working via Haverhill and also one from Ipswich and King's Lynn and two from Bury. Certain other trains, especially those from March via St. Ives, are often powered from March or King's Lynn sheds. Norwich locomotives appear irregularly-most frequently 'Sandringhams,' which appear sometimes on Stratford turns.
Recently a certain amount of variety has crept into the Liverpool St. workings as 'K3's' and 'K2's' have appeared fairly frequently. On 23/8/43 Nos. 4647, 2459 an 163 appeared on successive trains. On 19/9 the first part of the 2.20 p.m. ex Liverpool St. came in behind 2816(IPS) and the second behind 4631 (NOR).
The majority of trains on the King's Cross line continue to be hauled by 'C1' Atlantics. There are three turns on which Pacifics and 'V2's' appear fairly regularly-almost invariably King's Cross locomotives. There is a certain amount of variety with the 'Atlantics'; though those from sheds North of Peterborough are very rare. Two trains are usually hauled by Cambridge locos. almost always 'B17's' or 'Clauds.' Recently 2844(NOR) worked one of these, and must have been a very rare visitor at King's Cross. The turntable at Cambridge is now under repair and, as a result, the big engines do not work in as they cannot be turned on the LMS table. Cambridge 'Claud' workings compensate for the increase in strain on the GN sheds.
March is, of course, the main source of Goods locos. and its 'O2's' and 0-6-0's are abundant. Since the arrival of the American locomotives, the 'K3's' have become less common though the K2's' the more so. On a recent afternoon there were four types of 2-8-0 in the yard-'02'; USA; 'Austerity' (one from LNE and one from LMS); and a standard LMS freight built by SR. Later one of the Vulcan-built 'Austerities' came in (the other 2 were by N.B. Loco), followed by an 'O4.'
The LNW trains, as ever, specialise in bringing us Bletchley 'Princes,' 2-6-4T and 0-8-0. There is one regular 2D turn per day. Occasionally standard 0-6-0's (usually from the Midland division) appear and also standard 2-8-0's from 1A. Recently 4-4-0 420 (2A) appeared on a passenger train; another recent visitor has been Compound No. 900. On the Midland trains, Kettering supplies a variety of 2F 0-6-0's which, together with 2-4-0 No. 20216, appear to be well suited to this type of work on local passenger trains.
SLS/194401
13/10/1945 Darlington Works On 13/10, 3128 had just been completed (works number 1970), 2816 was in course of rebuilding to B.2, and B.16/3 924 had also been completed. Railcar 2257 looked very smart in an overall dull brown coat of paint. The only unusual loco seen was an 0-4-0T from the Corporation Gas 'Works. SLS/194601
31/12/1945 Darlington Works 2816 has the tender off C7 733 (tender No. 8648). It is expected that more conversions from B17 to B2 will follow soon. SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2816, name: FALLODON
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61616    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
07/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61616    

prev prev