Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2817 m/e 10/1930
LNER (1946) 1617 m/e 09/02/1946
BR 61617 w/e 26/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1930 FORD CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/210/1930
B212/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1930
Withdrawal Mon 11/08/1958
Scrapping During 08/1958
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 11/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2817, name: FORD CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1617    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61617    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/08/1954 Sightings Stratford Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
11/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61617    

prev prev