Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 176 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4688 Week
» 27194 Month
» 330384 Year
» 1551949 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2817 m/e 10/1930
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1617 on 09/02/1946
British Railways 61617 w/e 26/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1930 FORD CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/210/1930
B212/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1930
Withdrawal Mon 11/08/1958
Scrapping During 08/1958
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1930
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 11/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross on 05/01/1947
ALLOC HITL Hitchin (GNR) w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 25/06/1949
WDN 39B Sheffield Darnall on 08/05/1950
WDN   on 11/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2817, name: FORD CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1617    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61617    
11/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61617    

prev prev