Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 811 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 2048 Week
» 4630 Month
» 269263 Year
» 1490828 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2818 on 05/11/1930
LNER (1946) 1618 m/e 11/1946
BR 61618 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/11/1930 WYNYARD PARK

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/205/11/1930
B17/604/1958
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 05/11/1930
Withdrawal Sat 23/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 29 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 05/11/1930
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
32B Ipswich 4w/e 23/01/1954
31A Cambridge w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 23/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge 03/10/1947
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   23/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2818, name: WYNYARD PARK
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1618    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61618    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61618    

prev prev