Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 999 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7119 Week
» 18690 Month
» 266983 Year
» 1151364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2818   05/11/1930
LNER (1946) 1618 m/e 11/1946
BR 61618 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/11/1930 WYNYARD PARK

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/205/11/1930
B17/604/1958
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 05/11/1930
Withdrawal Sat 23/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 29 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
32B Ipswich 4w/e 23/01/1954
31A Cambridge w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 23/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2818, name: WYNYARD PARK
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1618    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61618    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61618    

prev prev