Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2819   08/11/1930
LNER (1946) 1619 m/e 08/1946
BR 61619 m/e 08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/11/1930 WELBECK ABBEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/208/11/1930
B17/601/1953
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 08/11/1930
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 27 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 18/10/1952
   Withdrawn 19/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Reports
Report Date Report
29/06/1957 On June 29 "B17" No. 61619 (31B) was used by York for a trip to Scarborough.


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/11/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2819, name: WELBECK ABBEY
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1619    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61619    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
29/06/1957 Report Report: On June 29 "B17" No. 61619 (31B) was used by York for a trip to Scarborough. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
19/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61619    

prev prev