Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 502 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4101 Week
» 10235 Month
» 238119 Year
» 1459684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2820 on 12/11/1930
LNER (1946) 1620 m/e 06/1946
BR 61620 m/e 11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/11/1930 CLUMBER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/212/11/1930
B17/612/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 12/11/1930
Withdrawal Mon 25/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 29 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 12/11/1930
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 3w/e 31/05/1950
31B March 4w/e 18/10/1952
31C Kings Lynn w/e 11/04/1959
   Withdrawn 25/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 18/04/1959
WDN   25/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1930 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2820, name: CLUMBER
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1620    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61620    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
25/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61620    

prev prev