Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1006 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7126 Week
» 18697 Month
» 266990 Year
» 1151371 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2821   21/11/1930
LNER (1946) 1621 m/e 04/1946
BR 61621 m/e 06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/11/1930 HATFIELD HOUSE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/221/11/1930
B17/601/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 21/11/1930
Withdrawal Mon 10/11/1958
Scrapping During 11/1958
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 23/09/1950
31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/04/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951
31B March 5w/e 23/06/1951
32B Ipswich 4w/e 20/06/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
31B March 4w/e 23/01/1954
   Withdrawn 10/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/11/1930 To Service To service as LNER Number 2821, name: HATFIELD HOUSE
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1621    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61621    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61621    

prev prev