Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 498 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2613 Week
» 25119 Month
» 328309 Year
» 1549874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2822 on 30/01/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1622 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 61622 m/e 05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
30/01/1931 ALNWICK CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/230/01/1931
B17/610/1943
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Sat 30/01/1931
Withdrawal Sat 27/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 30/01/1931
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 20/06/1953
   Withdrawn on 27/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham on 05/01/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe on 03/10/1947
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 30/07/1949
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   on 27/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2822, name: ALNWICK CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1622    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61622    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
27/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61622    

prev prev