Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1008 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7128 Week
» 18699 Month
» 266992 Year
» 1151373 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2823   03/02/1931
LNER (1946) 1623 m/e 07/1946
BR 61623 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/02/1931 LAMBTON CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/203/02/1931
B17/604/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 03/02/1931
Withdrawal Fri 31/07/1959
Scrapping Sun 30/08/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 31/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/02/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2823, name: LAMBTON CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1623    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61623    
07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61623    

prev prev