Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 257 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 257 Week
» 30547 Month
» 333737 Year
» 1555302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2823 on 03/02/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1623 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 61623 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/02/1931 LAMBTON CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/203/02/1931
B17/604/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 03/02/1931
Withdrawal Fri 31/07/1959
Scrapping Sun 30/08/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 03/02/1931
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 31/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge m/e 03/12/1945
WDN KX Kings Cross on 08/08/1947
WDN   on 31/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/02/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2823, name: LAMBTON CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1623    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61623    
31/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61623    

prev prev