Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 998 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7118 Week
» 18689 Month
» 266982 Year
» 1151363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2824   09/02/1931
LNER (1946) 1624 m/e 05/1946
BR 61624 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/02/1931 LUMLEY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 09/02/1931
Withdrawal Mon 16/03/1953
Scrapping During 03/1953
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 4w/e 18/10/1952
   Withdrawn 16/03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/02/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2824, name: LUMLEY CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1624    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61624    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 61624    

prev prev