Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 654 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 7017 Week
» 9599 Month
» 274232 Year
» 1495797 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2824 on 09/02/1931
LNER (1946) 1624 m/e 05/1946
BR 61624 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/02/1931 LUMLEY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 09/02/1931
Withdrawal Mon 16/03/1953
Scrapping During 03/1953
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 09/02/1931
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31B March 4w/e 18/10/1952
   Withdrawn 16/03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   16/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/02/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2824, name: LUMLEY CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1624    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61624    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 61624    

prev prev