Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2825   16/02/1931
LNER (1946) 1625   20/01/1946
BR 61625 m/e 02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
16/02/1931 RABY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 16/02/1931
Withdrawal Thu 03/12/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32B Ipswich 4w/e 20/06/1953
31A Cambridge w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 03/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/02/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2825, name: RABY CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1625    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61625    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
03/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61625    

prev prev