Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2826   04/03/1931
LNER (1946) 1626   21/03/1946
BR 61626 m/e 10/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/03/1931 BRANCEPETH CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/204/03/1931
B17/604/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 04/03/1931
Withdrawal Mon 11/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C Kings Lynn w/e 06/12/1958
31B March w/e 11/04/1959
31A Cambridge w/e 12/12/1959
   Withdrawn 11/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/03/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2826, name: BRANCEPETH CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1626    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61626    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
11/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61626    

prev prev