Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 106 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2420 Week
» 13713 Month
» 278346 Year
» 1499911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2827 on 18/03/1931
LNER (1946) 1627 m/e 08/1946
BR 61627 m/e 11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
18/03/1931 ASKE HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/218/03/1931
B17/611/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 18/03/1931
Withdrawal Fri 17/07/1959
Scrapping During 07/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 18/03/1931
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
31B March 5w/e 24/07/1954
   Withdrawn on 17/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge w/e 16/04/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 17/07/1954
WDN   on 17/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2827, name: ASKE HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1627    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61627    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61627    

prev prev