Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 114 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2428 Week
» 13721 Month
» 278354 Year
» 1499919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2829 on 08/04/1931
LNER (1946) 1629 m/e 11/1946
BR 61629 m/e 01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/04/1931 NAWORTH CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 08/04/1931
Withdrawal Fri 25/09/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 08/04/1931
NOR Norwich Thorpe on 01/01/1948
32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 21/08/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe 6w/e 25/12/1954
32B Ipswich 4w/e 20/08/1955
   Withdrawn on 25/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC ARD Ardsley on 07/09/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 13/12/1947
WDN ARD Ardsley on 22/07/1948
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   on 25/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2829, name: NAWORTH CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1629    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61629    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
25/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61629    

prev prev