Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1008 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7128 Week
» 18699 Month
» 266992 Year
» 1151373 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2830   28/04/1931
LNER (1946) 1630 m/e 08/1946
BR 61630 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
28/04/1931 TOTTENHAM HOTSPUR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/228/04/1931
B17/612/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 28/04/1931
Withdrawal Tue 19/08/1958
Scrapping During 08/1958
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 22/03/1952
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/03/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 16/05/1953
31B March 4w/e 23/01/1954
30A Stratford 5w/e 24/07/1954
31B March 4w/e 16/08/1958
   Withdrawn 19/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2830, name: TOTTENHAM HOTSPUR
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1630    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61630    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
19/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61630    

prev prev