Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1204 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1204 Week
» 3786 Month
» 268419 Year
» 1489984 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2831 on 01/05/1931
LNER (1946) 1631 m/e 09/1946
BR 61631 m/e 10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/05/1931 SERLBY HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/201/05/1931
B17/610/1957
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 01/05/1931
Withdrawal Fri 10/04/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 01/05/1931
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952
32B Ipswich 4w/e 14/02/1953
   Withdrawn 10/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   10/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/05/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2831, name: SERLBY HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1631    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61631    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
10/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61631    

prev prev