Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1082 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1082 Week
» 3664 Month
» 268297 Year
» 1489862 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2832 on 12/05/1931
BR 61632 w/e 26/06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/05/1931 ROYAL SOVEREIGN (1958)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/212/05/1931
B207/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 12/05/1931
Withdrawal Mon 02/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 12/05/1931
COL Colchester 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 02/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN DON Doncaster 05/08/1947
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   02/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Doncaster MPD A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Doncaster, 'Cl' 2832/50/51/66/86 and 'J3' 4113; they were all in a deplorable condition. SLS/194710
04/10/1958 E.R. locomotive news C12 67352 is now acting as Station pilot, Grantham and is ex-works, fully lined out; J52 68846 is ex-works, fully lined out at Hornsey; L.T.S.R. 4-4-2T 41969 is ex-works in unlined black at Plaistow; 61632, Belvoir Castle has been renamed Royal Sovereign and was ex-Stratford mid-October whilst 61671 was still in scrap yard with nameplates Royal Sovereign. SLS/195811
31/12/1958 Stratford Works (Old Works) Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/05/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2832, name: ROYAL SOVEREIGN (1958)
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61632    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
02/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61632    

prev prev