Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2720 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16126 Week
» 69142 Month
» 188669 Year
» 3215522 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2833 |
on |
28/05/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1633 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61633 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1527 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Wed 28/05/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 30/09/1959 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
m/e |
30/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
5w/e |
31/03/1956 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
3w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2833, name: KIMBOLTON CASTLE Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1527 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1633 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61633 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61633 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|