Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1004 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7124 Week
» 18695 Month
» 266988 Year
» 1151369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2833   28/05/1931
LNER (1946) 1633 m/e 09/1946
BR 61633 m/e 08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
28/05/1931 KIMBOLTON CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/228/05/1931
B17/608/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 28/05/1931
Withdrawal Wed 30/09/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 3w/e 31/05/1950
31A Cambridge 5w/e 24/03/1956
31B March 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 30/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/05/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2833, name: KIMBOLTON CASTLE
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1633    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61633    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61633    

prev prev