Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1000 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7120 Week
» 18691 Month
» 266984 Year
» 1151365 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2834   17/06/1931
LNER (1946) 1634 m/e 06/1946
BR 61634 m/e 09/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
17/06/1931 HINCHINGBROOKE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/217/06/1931
B17/601/1957
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 17/06/1931
Withdrawal Mon 04/08/1958
Scrapping During 08/1958
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 22/05/1954
31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/04/1956
31B March 4w/e 14/12/1957
   Withdrawn 04/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/06/1931 To Service To service as LNER Number 2834, name: HINCHINGBROOKE
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1634    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61634    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
04/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61634    

prev prev