Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 175 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4687 Week
» 27193 Month
» 330383 Year
» 1551948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2836 on 16/07/1931
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1636 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 61636 m/e 05/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
16/07/1931 HARLAXTON MANOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/216/07/1931
B17/605/1950
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Wed 16/07/1931
Withdrawal Wed 21/10/1959
Scrapping During 10/1959
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 16/07/1931
MAR March on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 3w/e 31/05/1950
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/07/1958
   Withdrawn on 21/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 14/07/1958
WDN   on 21/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/07/1931 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2836, name: HARLAXTON MANOR
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1636    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61636    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
21/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61636    

prev prev