Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14315 Week
» 67331 Month
» 186858 Year
» 3213711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2836 |
on |
16/07/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1636 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61636 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1530 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Wed 16/07/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 21/10/1959 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
m/e |
30/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
14/07/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/07/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2836, name: HARLAXTON MANOR Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1530 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1636 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61636 |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61636 |
|
|