Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 62 Today
» 1367 Yesterday
» 6596 Week
» 6596 Month
» 195731 Year
» 1417296 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2837   01/03/1933
LNER (1946) 1637 m/e 06/1946
BR 61637 m/e 09/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/03/1933 THORPE HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/201/03/1933
B17/611/1957
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Thu 01/03/1933
Withdrawal Thu 24/09/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 26 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 01/03/1933
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953
32B Ipswich 4w/e 25/07/1953
   Withdrawn 24/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   24/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/03/1933 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2837, name: THORPE HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1637    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61637    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
24/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61637    

prev prev