Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1201 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 1201 Week
» 3783 Month
» 268416 Year
» 1489981 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2838 on 02/03/1933
LNER (1946) 1638 m/e 08/1946
BR 61638 m/e 08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/03/1933 MELTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/202/03/1933
B17/612/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 02/03/1933
Withdrawal Mon 17/03/1958
Scrapping During 03/1958
Service Life 25 yrs , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 02/03/1933
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31B March 5w/e 22/09/1951
   Withdrawn 17/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March w/e 15/09/1951
WDN   17/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/10/1948 Darlington Works The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. SLS/194811
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/03/1933 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2838, name: MELTON HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1638    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61638    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61638    

prev prev