Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 199 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4711 Week
» 27217 Month
» 330407 Year
» 1551972 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2839 on 11/05/1933
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1639   1946
British Railways 61639 w/e 06/05/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/05/1933 NORWICH CITY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/211/05/1933
B201/1946
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 11/05/1933
Withdrawal Mon 18/05/1959
Scrapping During 05/1959
Service Life 26 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 11/05/1933
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn on 18/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 05/01/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 02/04/1949
WDN NWE New England on 24/01/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   on 18/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/01/1946 Darlington Works 2839, rebuilt to B2, came off works on 17/1. It is suggested that 10000's original boiler is still in use at Stooperdale boiler shop, Darlington Works. Can any member give any information on this point? SLS/194604
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
31/03/1948 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/05/1933 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2839, name: NORWICH CITY
Built at Darlington Works
   
1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1639    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 61639    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61639    

prev prev