Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2843   03/05/1935
LNER (1946) 1643 m/e 09/1946
BR 61643 m/e 08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/05/1935 CHAMPION LODGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/303/05/1935
B17/610/1954
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 03/05/1935
Withdrawal Mon 14/07/1958
Scrapping During 07/1958
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 5w/e 16/02/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/09/1952
31B March 4w/e 13/12/1952
   Withdrawn 14/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/05/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2843, name: CHAMPION LODGE
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1643    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61643    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61643    

prev prev