Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1008 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7128 Week
» 18699 Month
» 266992 Year
» 1151373 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2844   09/05/1935
LNER (1946) 1644 m/e 12/1946
BR 61644 4w/e 26/03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/05/1935 EARLHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley / E. Thompson
Class B2
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/309/05/1935
B203/1949
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 09/05/1935
Withdrawal Wed 25/11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NOR Norwich Thorpe 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 25/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/05/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2844, name: EARLHAM HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1644    
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61644    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
25/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61644    

prev prev