Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 163 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4675 Week
» 27181 Month
» 330371 Year
» 1551936 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2845 on 14/06/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1645 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 61645 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
14/06/1935 THE SUFFOLK REGIMENT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/314/06/1935
B17/612/1952
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 14/06/1935
Withdrawal Thu 26/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys
Video Clip Naming ceremony at Bury St. Edmunds, 27th June 1935

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 14/06/1935
IPS Ipswich on 01/01/1948
CAM Cambridge m/e 30/11/1949
30A Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford 3w/e 14/05/1955
30E Colchester m/e 21/07/1956
30A Stratford 4w/e 22/09/1956
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
31B March 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn on 26/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 12/10/1946
ALLOC KX Kings Cross on 05/01/1947
WDN KX Kings Cross on 29/04/1947
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 31B March 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 26/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2845, name: THE SUFFOLK REGIMENT
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1645    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61645    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
26/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61645    

prev prev