Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2845   14/06/1935
LNER (1946) 1645 m/e 09/1946
BR 61645 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
14/06/1935 THE SUFFOLK REGIMENT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/314/06/1935
B17/612/1952
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 14/06/1935
Withdrawal Thu 26/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys
Video Clip Naming ceremony at Bury St. Edmunds, 27th June 1935

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
CAM Cambridge m/e 30/11/1949
30A Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford 3w/e 14/05/1955
30E Colchester m/e 21/07/1956
30A Stratford 4w/e 22/09/1956
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
31B March 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 26/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2845, name: THE SUFFOLK REGIMENT
Built at Darlington Works
   
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1645    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61645    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
26/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61645    

prev prev