Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 393 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 13386 Month
» 321367 Year
» 1205748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2846   23/08/1935
LNER (1946) 1646 m/e 12/1946
BR 61646 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
23/08/1935 GILWELL PARK

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/323/08/1935
B17/602/1951
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 23/08/1935
Withdrawal Fri 09/01/1959
Scrapping During 01/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MAR March 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A Stratford 5w/e 16/02/1952
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 22/09/1956
31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
31B March 4w/e 14/12/1957
   Withdrawn 09/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/08/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2846, name: GILWELL PARK
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1646    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61646    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61646    

prev prev