Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1004 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7124 Week
» 18695 Month
» 266988 Year
» 1151369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2847   10/09/1935
LNER (1946) 1647 m/e 01/1947
BR 61647 m/e 03/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/09/1935 HELMINGHAM HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/310/09/1935
B17/406/1936
B17/602/1958
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 10/09/1935
Withdrawal Wed 18/11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys
Information Swapped tenders with 2858 in 1936 thereby becoming a class B17/4

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge w/e 31/10/1959
   Withdrawn 18/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/09/1935 To Service To service as LNER Number 2847, name: HELMINGHAM HALL
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1647    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61647    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
18/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61647    

prev prev