Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 73 Today
» 1187 Yesterday
» 2387 Week
» 13680 Month
» 278313 Year
» 1499878 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2848 on 03/03/1936
LNER (1946) 1648 m/e 12/1946
BR 61648 m/e 04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/03/1936 ARSENAL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/403/03/1936
B17/610/1957
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 03/03/1936
Withdrawal Mon 01/12/1958
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 03/03/1936
MAR March on 01/01/1948
30E Colchester m/e 21/07/1956
30A Stratford 4w/e 22/09/1956
   Withdrawn on 01/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford 5w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   on 01/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1941 Westinghouse Brake fitted
04/1941 Vacuum Brakes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/03/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2848, name: ARSENAL
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1941 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
04/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1648    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61648    
21/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61648    

prev prev