Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2757 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16163 Week
» 69179 Month
» 188706 Year
» 3215559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2849 |
on |
09/03/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1649 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61649 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
B17 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1659 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
Mon 09/03/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/02/1958 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/03/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2849, name: SHEFFIELD UNITED Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1659 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1649 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61649 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61649 |
|
|
02/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|