Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 65 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7525 Week
» 5038 Month
» 232922 Year
» 1454487 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2849 on 09/03/1936
LNER (1946) 1649 m/e 11/1946
BR 61649 m/e 06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/03/1936 SHEFFIELD UNITED

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/409/03/1936
B17/603/1954
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 09/03/1936
Withdrawal Mon 10/02/1958
Scrapping During 02/1959
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 09/03/1936
IPS Ipswich 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 10/02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross 18/01/1947
ALLOC COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 23/02/1947
ALLOC ARD Ardsley w/e 08/11/1947
WDN ARD Ardsley 19/07/1948
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 05/11/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1947 Kings Cross MPD No. 2849 (formerly 4419 with booster) is back at K.X. repainted black. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/03/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2849, name: SHEFFIELD UNITED
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1649    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61649    
10/02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61649    

prev prev