Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 7 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2868 Week
» 21650 Month
» 269943 Year
» 1154324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2850   09/03/1936
LNER (1946) 1650 m/e 11/1946
BR 61650 m/e 10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/03/1936 GRIMSBY TOWN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/409/03/1936
B17/602/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 09/03/1936
Withdrawal Wed 03/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
WFD Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
30A Stratford 5w/e 23/06/1951
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
   Withdrawn 03/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/03/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 2850, name: GRIMSBY TOWN
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1650    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61650    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
03/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61650    

prev prev