Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 122 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1359 Week
» 3941 Month
» 268574 Year
» 1490139 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2850 on 09/03/1936
LNER (1946) 1650 m/e 11/1946
BR 61650 m/e 10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/03/1936 GRIMSBY TOWN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/409/03/1936
B17/602/1955
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 09/03/1936
Withdrawal Wed 03/09/1958
Scrapping During 09/1958
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 09/03/1936
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948
WFD Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
30A Stratford 5w/e 23/06/1951
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
   Withdrawn 03/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 17/11/1946
WDN DON Doncaster 05/08/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   03/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Doncaster MPD A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Doncaster, 'Cl' 2832/50/51/66/86 and 'J3' 4113; they were all in a deplorable condition. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/03/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2850, name: GRIMSBY TOWN
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1650    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61650    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
03/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 61650    

prev prev