Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 185 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 185 Week
» 6319 Month
» 234203 Year
» 1455768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2851 on 30/03/1936
LNER (1946) 1651 m/e 08/1946
BR 61651 m/e 01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
30/03/1936 DERBY COUNTY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/430/03/1936
B17/606/1953
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 30/03/1936
Withdrawal Fri 14/08/1959
Scrapping During 08/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 30/03/1936
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948
WFD Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
38A Colwick 4w/e 20/10/1951
30E Colchester 4w/e 19/12/1953
31A Cambridge w/e 14/02/1959
   Withdrawn 14/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick 17/11/1946
WDN DON Doncaster 05/08/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   14/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1947 Doncaster MPD A number of withdrawn locos. are still lying at various sheds awaiting removal to Works for cutting up; amongst those recently seen were: at Doncaster, 'Cl' 2832/50/51/66/86 and 'J3' 4113; they were all in a deplorable condition. SLS/194710
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2851, name: DERBY COUNTY
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1651    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61651    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
14/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61651    

prev prev