Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 176 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2515 Week
» 8649 Month
» 236533 Year
» 1458098 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2852 on 02/04/1936
LNER (1946) 1652 m/e 12/1946
BR 61652 m/e 04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/04/1936 DARLINGTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/402/04/1936
B17/603/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 02/04/1936
Withdrawal Thu 17/09/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 02/04/1936
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/12/1950
   Withdrawn 17/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   17/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/04/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2852, name: DARLINGTON
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1652    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61652    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61652    

prev prev