Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1001 Today
» 948 Yesterday
» 7121 Week
» 18692 Month
» 266985 Year
» 1151366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 2852   02/04/1936
LNER (1946) 1652 m/e 12/1946
BR 61652 m/e 04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/04/1936 DARLINGTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/402/04/1936
B17/603/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 02/04/1936
Withdrawal Thu 17/09/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/12/1950
   Withdrawn 17/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/04/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 2852, name: DARLINGTON
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1652    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61652    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61652    

prev prev