Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1022 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6620 Week
» 29126 Month
» 332316 Year
» 1553881 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2853 on 06/04/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1653 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 61653 m/e 06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/04/1936 HUDDERSFIELD TOWN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/406/04/1936
B17/605/1954
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Mon 06/04/1936
Withdrawal Mon 25/01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 06/04/1936
CLK Colwick on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/12/1950
31B March 4w/e 14/12/1957
   Withdrawn on 25/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 19/01/1947
WDN DON Doncaster on 27/05/1947
ALLOC 31A Cambridge m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   on 25/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
31/05/1951 \"Heart of Midlothian\" service A1 No. 60151 Midlothian fitted with new type double chimney worked the inaugural 'Heart of Midlothian' Festival train from King's Cross, with a complete set of new standard coaches. No. 60116, lately named Hal o'the Wynd has also acquired a similar chimney. B17 No. 61653, on the other hand, is 'recently off works with what appears to be a K3 chimney and looks rather odd: it is appearing regularly at the moment on the 'Royal' working, No. 61671 being a casualty yet again. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/04/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2853, name: HUDDERSFIELD TOWN
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1653    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61653    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
25/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 61653    

prev prev