Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 299 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 299 Week
» 30589 Month
» 333779 Year
» 1555344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2854 on 17/04/1936
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 1654 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 61654 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
17/04/1936 SUNDERLAND

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class B17
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B17/417/04/1936
B17/604/1948
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 17/04/1936
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 17/04/1936
CAM Cambridge on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
31B March 4w/e 24/10/1953
30E Colchester 5w/e 23/07/1955
30A Stratford 5w/e 22/10/1955
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/07/1958
   Withdrawn on 06/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 09/07/1949
WDN 39B Sheffield Darnall on 03/04/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 14/07/1958
WDN   on 06/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1941 Vacuum Brakes fitted
04/1941 Westinghouse Brake fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/04/1936 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2854, name: SUNDERLAND
Built at Darlington Works
   
04/1941 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes fitted    
04/1941 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1654    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 61654    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
06/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 61654    

prev prev